Weingarten, David (CPSO#: 26065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
Hernia Centre
7750 Bayview Avenue
P O Box 370
Markham ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 905 889-1125 Ext. 268
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WEINGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINGARTEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1978