Weinreb, Ilan (CPSO#: 76392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 11E403
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5146
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilan Weinreb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Weinreb ( CPSO# 76392 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Room 11E403
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAN WEINREB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINREB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006