Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Weinreich-Bross, Pnina (CPSO#: 57011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Fax: (905) 881-3198
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PNINA WEINREICH-BROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINREICH-BROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987