Weinroth, Ian Sean (CPSO#: 82468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Branson Site
1 South
555 FInch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: (416) 635-2428
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Weinroth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Weinroth ( CPSO# 82468 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Site
1 South
555 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-2505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN SEAN WEINROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010