Weinshenker, Brian Gary (CPSO#: 56271)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1995