Weinstein, Julie Lynne (CPSO#: 88875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wawa Family Health Team
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie L. Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weinstein ( CPSO# 88875 )

Business Address:
Wawa Family Health Team
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-2335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LYNNE WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010