Weinstein, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 68223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 7729
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: (416) 813-8345
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998