Weinstein, Robert Paul (CPSO#: 55410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
8th Floor
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert P. Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Weinstein ( CPSO# 55410 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
8th Floor
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1986