Weir, Matthew Alexander (CPSO#: 79181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-213
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2998
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir ( CPSO# 79181 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room A10-213
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2998

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALEXANDER WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007