Weir, Michele Monique (CPSO#: 62253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36359
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE MONIQUE WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 01 Jul 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991