Weisberg, Fay Gladys (CPSO#: 55610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: Leinburd, Fay Gladys (used until: 22 Sep 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
4025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone: (416) 924-4666
Fax: (416) 924-7099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fay G. Weisberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Weisberg ( CPSO# 55610 )

Business Address:
Suite 215
4025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 221-7545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAY GLADYS WEISBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986