Weisbrod, Lawrence (CPSO#: 66511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 310
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 640-0661
Fax: (416) 640-0664
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M1-202C
Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: (416) 480-4481
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

600-340 College Street
Toronto, Ontario
M5T 3A9
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

221-2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6403
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 66511 )

Business Address:
One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 640-0661

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Science Centre
Eye Clinic M1-202C
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4762

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Eye Clinic
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 469-6403

Business Address:
Unit 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998