Weisbrod, Wilfred Bernard (CPSO#: 16618)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007