Weisbrot, Jeffrey Jakob (CPSO#: 55753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York-Med Medical Arts Buliding
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weisbrot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Brill ( CPSO# 56969 )
Dr. J. Weisbrot ( CPSO# 55753 )

Business Address:
York-Med Medical Arts Building
404 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAKOB WEISBROT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987