Weisdorf, Thea Marie (CPSO#: 64074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Weisdorf ( CPSO# 64074 )
Dr. A. Kanee ( CPSO# 62543 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Obstetrics
Gynaecology Associates
502 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-8748

Business Address:
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEA MARIE WEISDORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISDORF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 28 Feb 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992