Weiser, Brent Alden (CPSO#: 55992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Keele Ingram Professional Centre
2221 Keele Street
Suite 209
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 249-4255
Fax: (416) 249-4791
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brent A. Weiser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weiser ( CPSO# 55992 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 249-4255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT ALDEN WEISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986