Weisleder, Louis Moshe (CPSO#: 58144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A15
1250 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone: (905) 828-1587
Fax: (905) 997-0547
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis Weisleder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weisleder ( CPSO# 58144 )

Business Address:
Unit A15
1250 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone Number: (905) 997-7200

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
2nd Floor
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 782-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS MOSHE WEISLEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISLEDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988