Weisman, David Seth (CPSO#: 62019)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIV OF MED AND DENTISTRY OF NEW JERSEY, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995