Weiss, Shelly Karen (CPSO#: 55397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7220
Fax: (416) 813-7096
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLY KAREN WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987