Weiss, William Victor (CPSO#: 24555)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 22 Nelson Street Wes, Meaford, ON N4L 1R1
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016