Weissglas, Juma Justin Mark (CPSO#: 84427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
FG21B - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Weissglas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weissglas ( CPSO# 84427 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG21B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUMA JUSTIN MARK WEISSGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISSGLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011