Weisz, Janet Irma (CPSO#: 52140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1433 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G5
Phone: (905) 637-0352
Fax: (905) 637-2966
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET IRMA WEISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985