Weisz, Karen (CPSO#: 98018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Family and Community
Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 Duncan Mills Road
Suite 701
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
Phone: 416 229 6300 Ext. 17
Fax: 416 229 6283
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Weisz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Weisz ( CPSO# 98018 )

Business Address:
701 - 240 Duncan Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 229-6300

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WEISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014