Weitz, Jeffrey Ian (CPSO#: 43956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thrombosis and Atherosclerosis
Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-574-8550
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Weitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weitz ( CPSO# 43956 )
Dr. J. Masterson ( CPSO# 62569 )

Business Address:
Thrombosis and Atherosclerosis
Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Suite C5-123
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 574-8550

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
McMaster Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY IAN WEITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1985