Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Weitzman, Sheila Shura (CPSO#: 32432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5886
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA SHURA WEITZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981