Weizman, David Aron (CPSO#: 74792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2200 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (905) 417-7850
Fax: (905) 417-4866
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Weizman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weizman ( CPSO# 74792 )

Business Address:
104 - 2200 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 5V2
Phone Number: (905) 417-7850

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARON WEIZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005