Weksberg, Alfred (CPSO#: 33808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 324
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 499-8242
Fax: (416) 499-3945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weksberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weksberg ( CPSO# 33808 )

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 324
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 499-8242

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED WEKSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEKSBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1982