Welbourne, David Robert (CPSO#: 60751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Science Centre
Pathology Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6584
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Welbourne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Welbourne ( CPSO# 60751 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT WELBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Laboratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991