Welch, Stephen Armand (CPSO#: 79927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Center
London Regional Cancer Program
A3 917
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Welch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Welch ( CPSO# 79927 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Program
A3 917 - 790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ARMAND WELCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2005