Weldon, Charles (CPSO#: 52128)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 28 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2010