Wells, Jennie Louise (CPSO#: 67990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Connecticut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennie Wells Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wells ( CPSO# 67990 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
A2-129
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIE LOUISE WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1996