Wells, Mark Douglas (CPSO#: 52836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
285 East State Street
Columbus OH  43215
United States
Phone: (614) 566-9496
Fax: (614) 566-8668

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DOUGLAS WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1988