Wells, Richard Alexander (CPSO#: 64213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre - T2 006
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4757
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLeod-Wells Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wells ( CPSO# 64213 )
Dr. A. McLeod ( CPSO# 65265 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite D - 677
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5376

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite T 2 - 006
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1995