Welsford, Michelle (CPSO#: 69388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences CPER
Unit 201, 430 McNeilly Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 5E3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 71223
Fax: (905) 643-1104
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Welsford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Welsford ( CPSO# 69388 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
430 McNeilly Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 5E3
Phone Number: (905) 643-1103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE WELSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000