Weltman, Glen Louis (CPSO#: 62479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
770 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M6A 1C2
Phone: (416) 256-9642
Electoral District: 10


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GLEN LOUIS WELTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991