Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wendling, Lisa Christine (CPSO#: 69155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Russell M Hall Family Health Centre
P O Box 550
32 South Court Street East
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone: (519) 863-2338
Fax: (519) 863-2073
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Wendling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wendling ( CPSO# 69155 )

Business Address:
32 South Court Street East
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone Number: (519) 863-2338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA CHRISTINE WENDLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WENDLING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1997