Wenning, Joan Barbara (CPSO#: 56342)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1988