Wenske, Thomas Roland (CPSO#: 67287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 17898
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T R Wenske Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wenske ( CPSO# 67287 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2005

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Jun 2005 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 26, 2005, Dr. Thomas Roland Wenske undertakes to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to restrict his medical practice to the
            following:

                  i.    assisting with cardiac surgery
                  ii.   participating in an on-call schedule for in-patient care
                  iii.  assessing potential cardiac surgery patients in the emergency
                        departments as the need arises
                  iv.   assessing post-operative patients in the Intensive Care Unit as the
                        need arises