Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Went, John Harvey (CPSO#: 21004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HARVEY WENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1967