Wentlandt, Kirsten (CPSO#: 84620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K Wentlandt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wentlandt ( CPSO# 84620 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 9NU-925
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN WENTLANDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WENTLANDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 29 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009