Weresch, Justin Adam (CPSO#: 103364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main St. W.
3rd floor
Hamilton, Ont, L8P 1H6
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-546-9885
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN ADAM WERESCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERESCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016