Werhun, Robert Steven (CPSO#: 70166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z6
Phone: (905) 371-1117
Fax: (905) 371-9986
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Werhun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Werhun ( CPSO# 70166 )

Business Address:
5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z6
Phone Number: (905) 371-1117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STEVEN WERHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERHUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000