Werier, Joel Michael (CPSO#: 63630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
C C W 1661
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8213
Fax: (613) 737-8150
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H8L1
Canada
Phone: 6137378213
Fax: 6137378150
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Werier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Werier ( CPSO# 63630 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
CCW1661 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8213

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL MICHAEL WERIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1998 to 15 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992