Werneck, Christiane Campolina Furquim (CPSO#: 82044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Dec 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-1884
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4466
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 7557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Werneck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Werneck ( CPSO# 82044 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-1884

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 08 Dec 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2004 to 06 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Christiane Campolina Furquim Werneck may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Vascular Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Werneck holds an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Werneck no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.