Werry, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 67240)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 Burkebrook Place Unit 406 Toronto, ON M4G 0A1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 11 Aug 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 25 Jan 1998
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015