Wertman, Antoinette (CPSO#: 30507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 632-8701
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Ave. West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 632-8701
Fax: (416) 632-8718
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTOINETTE WERTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERTMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1978