Wesa, Mina (CPSO#: 99346)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, German

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2012 to 28 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2015