Wesley, Steven John (CPSO#: 68874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare, Hamilton
Centre for mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Central East Correctional Centre
Ministry of Community Safety
and Correctional Services
541 Highway 36 P O Box 4500
Lindsay ON  K9V 4S6
Canada
Phone: (705) 328-6000
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

89 Richmond Blvd
Napanee ON  K7R 3S1
Canada
Phone: 613 354 9701
Fax: 613 354 3944
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

454 Maple Avenue
Burlington ON  L7S 1M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 681-9646
Fax: (905) 681-9811
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley ( CPSO# 68874 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Central East Correctional Centre
Ministry of Community Safety
and Correctional Services
541 Highway 36 P O Box 4500
Lindsay ON  K9V 4S6
Phone Number: (705) 328-6000

Business Address:
454 Maple Avenue
Burlington ON  L7S 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 681-9646

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 15 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2008

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Steven John Wesley's admission and found 
 that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient (behaviour or
remarks of a sexual nature by the 
 member towards the patient) and disgraceful,
dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.  

The 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Wesley attend before the panel to be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;  
2.	The Registrar impose the 
 terms, conditions and limitations contained in an undertaking signed by Dr. Wesley, whose terms 
 require, among other things, an apology to the complainant in writing, and that Dr. Wesley have a 
 workplace monitor and a treating psychiatrist, both to report regularly to the Registrar;
3.	Dr. 
 Wesley have a third party in attendance at all times while seeing female patients;
4.	Dr. Wesley 
 post an irrevocable letter of credit, or other security, acceptable to the College, in the amount 
 of $10,000.00 to reimburse the College for funding provided to the complainant under the programme 
 required under section 85.7 of the Code;
5.	Dr. Wesley pay $2,500.00 to the College toward the 
 costs of the hearing; and
6.	Any application Dr. Wesley may wish to bring in the future to vary 
 the order be brought before a panel of the Discipline Committee as then constituted.

On December 
 2, 2008, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Wesley, varied the Order of June 24, 
 2002, and directed the removal of the terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wesley's 
 certificate of registration.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002