Wesley-James, Timothy (CPSO#: 54563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Urology Associates
77 Westmount Road
Suite 205
Guelph ON  N1H 2K9
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Wesley-James Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wesley-James ( CPSO# 54563 )

Business Address:
Guelph Urology Associates
77 Westmount Road
Suite 205
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 824-7272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY WESLEY-JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY-JAMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988