Wesolowski, Carl Adam (CPSO#: 56291)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008